HADASSAH MEDICAL RELIEF ASSOCIATION U.K.

Charity number: 1040848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

fundraising for Hadassah Medical Organisation (HMO)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • H M R A U K (Working name)
  • HADASSAH UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Natalie Greenwold Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Dr Monica Bloch Trustee 05 May 2020
None on record
Erica Marks Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Howard Daitz Trustee 04 October 2018
None on record
Jean Jacques Roboh Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record
David Waterman Trustee 08 July 2008
None on record
Guilda Shamash Trustee 30 April 2002
None on record
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM Trustee 29 November 1995
DEVONSHIRE STREET CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PETER CRUDDAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DENISE COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SHIRLEY YOUNG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RUTH AND JACK LUNZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STELLA AND ALEXANDER MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYBIL SHINE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
YONI JESNER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMERICAN JEWISH JOINT DISTRIBUTION COMMITTEE (UK ) TRUST
Received: On time
JANET WOLFSON DE BOTTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CISSIE ROSEFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE POTEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARNETT AND SYLVIA SHINE NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ADLER TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SHAARE ZEDEK UK
Received: On time
WORCESTER COLLEGE OXFORD ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARCUS MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MORRIS LEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL TRAUMA AND THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SURVIVORS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NEW ISRAEL FUND
Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK
Received: On time
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WEIZMANN INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £1.16m £878.74k £715.25k £195.16k £1.25m
Total expenditure £384.69k £1.93m £367.96k £511.99k £1.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £869.07k £705.35k N/A £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £41.36k £9.67k £9.90k N/A £2.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £848.58k £61.30k £197.59k N/A £686.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £351.61k £1.91m £346.18k N/A £1.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.07k £12.53k £12.02k N/A £18.18k
Expenditure - Governance £8.07k £8.03k £5.90k N/A £23.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.77m £202.39k N/A £1.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £9.75k £9.75k N/A £9.75k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Own use assets £0 £0 £765 N/A £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £1.65m £629.33k £937.40k N/A £718.49k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £12.23k £11.94k £9.64k N/A £4.88k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 05 April 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 04 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 15 April 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 15 April 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hadassah UK
Beit Meir Building
44B Albert Road
Hendon
London
Phone:
02082022860