THE ANNE AND JOHN WALTERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES DONATIONS TO ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER CHARITIES THAT SUPPORT: 1. THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY 2. THE ALLEVIATION OF SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY AND THE PROVISION OF CARE, TREATMENT AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY AND THEIR FAMILIES 3. SUCH OTHER LOCAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 September 1994: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 November 2012: Re-registered
- ANNE AND JOHN WALTERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R WISHART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IAN GEORGE HUMPHREY | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|||||
ANDREW FISHER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.12k | £157.54k | £346.54k | £233.22k | £243.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.59k | £165.98k | £206.60k | £216.18k | £216.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RESEARCH INTO ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH OR BEARING UPON THE CAUSES PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY IN ALL ITS FORMS (2) THE ALLEVIATION OF SUFFERING OCCASIONED BY EPILEPSY AND THE PROVISION OF CARE TREATMENT AND SUPPORT FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS (3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
153a Metchley Lane
BIRMINGHAM
B17 0JL
- Phone:
- 07973228656
- Email:
- admin@ajwtrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window