THE MANCHESTER UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals (including loans) in relation to medical / health / sickness and poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 September 1994: Standard registration
- MANCHESTER UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB BENEVOLENT TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Clifford Baty | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WARDLE | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
ALAN GOWLING | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID GILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71 | £70 | £3 | £10 | £241 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £9.80k | £6.59k | £0 | £14.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 June 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 June 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 June 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY MANCHESTER UNITED PLC OR THE MANCHESTER UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB PLC AND THE WIDOWS, CHILDREN (INCLUDING STEP AND ADOPTED CHILDREN) AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF THE PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SO EMPLOYED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manchester United Ltd
Old Trafford
Sir Matt Busby Way
Manchester
M16 0RA
- Phone:
- 01618688338
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window