SANGAT SIKH TEMPLE, IPSWICH

Charity number: 1040936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1, To provide facilities to the Sikh community in Ipswich for holding prayers, religious ceremonies and functions; 2, To advance the Sikh religion, advance education in subjects such as the Sikh religion in language and in other subjects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £48,928
Total expenditure: £49,277

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GURU NANAK GURDWARA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jaswant Singh Trustee 30 April 2022
None on record
Tirlochan Singh Trustee 31 March 2018
SANGAT SIKH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SUKHCHINE SINGH Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
SATNAM SINGH Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
BALWANT SINGH Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.58k £9.44k £34.04k £43.62k £48.93k
Total expenditure £29.85k £18.25k £19.63k £23.98k £49.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £351 £1.08k £200

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2024 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 October 2024 252 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
719 BRAMFORD ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 2LT
Phone:
07707377034
Website:

No information available