CHERRY TREE PLAYGROUP (RAWTENSTALL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cherry Tree Pre- School offers pre-school education to children aged between 2 and 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £63,236 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Lancashire
Governance
- 21 September 1994: Standard registration
- CHERRY TREE PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH WINSTANLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angela Trow | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DOHERTY | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANN JAYCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.17k | £60.83k | £64.44k | £65.64k | £78.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.83k | £61.49k | £61.42k | £71.83k | £67.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.95k | £56.38k | £61.02k | N/A | £63.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 14 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Tree Pre School
Cherry Crescent
Rossendale
BB4 6DL
- Phone:
- 01706229153
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window