HALKEVI-THE KURDISH AND TURKISH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alaettin Sinayic | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oladapo Olajide Awosokanre | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Adam Michael Marques Almeida | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elif Sarican | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
YASAR ISMAILOGLU | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.17k | £87.19k | £117.00k | £132.93k | £114.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.15k | £101.75k | £121.00k | £118.14k | £117.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | £14.50k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.59k | £30.00k | £14.50k | £23.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH MAY 1994
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE KURDISH AND TURKISH COMMUNITIES IN BRITAIN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE KURDISH AND TURKISH COMMUNITIES IN BRITAIN; (B)TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (C)TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED; (D)TO DO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31-33 DALSTON LANE
LONDON
E8 3DF
- Phone:
- 07958685135
- Email:
- halkeviuk@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window