THE HARRINGAY CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity povides accommodation/space for the occupation of other charitable organisation to utilise for children's activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 20 September 1994: Standard registration
- 18 June 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 11 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE IN HARRINGAY AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS THROUGH LEISURETIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED AND IN PARTICUALR WITH A VIEW TO CARRYING OUT THESE OBJECTIVES TO ORGANISE RUN AND MAINTAIN A CLUB FOR SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
HARRINGAY AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window