Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE DRAMA CENTRE LONDON

Charity number: 1040963
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 June 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required