BURLEY GATE PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burley Gate Pre Scool holds all its activities within the pre school grounds and the adjacent village hall.We are situated in an outstanding rural location.In a purpose built log cabin that was opened in May 2005 funded by National lottery grants and other organisations.Burley Gate Pre school is open to children from the age of 2 years upto pre school age providing high quality care and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 27 September 1994: Standard registration
- 22 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.00k | £50.87k | £54.60k | £53.45k | £46.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.64k | £52.47k | £53.64k | £53.05k | £47.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 22 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2015
(These accounts |
22 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 17 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 17 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 24 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 27 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 26 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 24 June 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window