Financial history OXFORD FILM AND VIDEO MAKERS LIMITED

Charity number: 1041014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £218.00k £208.24k £268.87k £224.49k £175.54k
Total expenditure £218.48k £189.02k £233.18k £242.54k £224.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.75k N/A £55.64k £25.00k N/A