BLACKLANDS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds by holding several events during the school year. Funds are spent to enhance the school experience of Ark Blacklands Primary Academy pupils. A proportion of funds are allocated annually to each year group to be spent on workshops/trips. The remaining funds are used for extra books/ICT equipment, play equipment etc. Any staff member can request funding by applying to the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 September 1994: Standard registration
- Friends of Ark Blacklands (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCY COLLINS | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BETHANY BOWEN LOADSMAN | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tania Davies-Blackwell | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Tammy Louise Seaton | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.76k | £14.76k | £6.33k | £6.61k | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.28k | £11.13k | £9.33k | £2.72k | £3.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 January 2021 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11TH OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ark Blacklands Primary Academy
Osborne Close
HASTINGS
TN34 2HU
- Phone:
- 07968852829
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window