Financial history GOOD DEED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1041053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £93.16k £76.84k £2.46k £124.94k £80.10k
Total expenditure £92.62k £79.82k £0 £119.05k £87.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A