Financial history 21ST COVENTRY (EASTERN GREEN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1041057
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.21k £26.17k £9.85k £22.24k £26.52k
Total expenditure £29.92k £11.59k £14.94k £18.96k £16.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A