Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF CHESTERFIELD SCARSDALE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1041058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 June 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 June 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required