ETHIOPIAN WELFARE ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ethiopian welfare is a community organisation based in Camden which has worked with refugees since 1993 in a variety of ways. The charity is established to relief hardship, address causes of poverity and advance the education of the public, especially of those in disadvantaged, by providing information advice guidance and support, providing basic skills and learning opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 23 September 1994: Standard registration
- ETHIOPIAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEMHAL ABEBE | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tsion Tesfamariam | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
AHMED MOUSE | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alem Abay | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
HABTOM MESFUN | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.70k | £4.85k | £7.84k | £16.80k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.14k | £2.87k | £4.03k | £8.92k | £5.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.80k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 June 2022 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 1ST MAY 1994
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF PERSONS OF ETHIOPIAN ORIGIN BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE DETERMINE; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES IN COMPUTING ENGLISH AND ETHIOPIAN LANGUAGES; (3)TO ADVANCE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEPRESSION AND POST-TRAUMATIC SHOCK SYNDROME AND BY THE RELIF OF THE DISABLED;(4)TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Crowndale Rd
CAMDEN
London
NW1 1TT
- Phone:
- 07908767398
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window