Financial history WALKINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1041079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £72.63k £75.40k £85.17k £74.28k £107.55k
Total expenditure £57.23k £68.17k £81.88k £77.64k £83.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A