Trustees WALKINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1041079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Floater Chair 16 November 2022
None on record
Jade Rozenbroek Trustee 04 November 2024
None on record
Lois Gilbertson Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Annie Clarke Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Joanna DeMoulpied Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Emily Bird Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Caroline Bagshaw Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
Charlotte Glasby Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
Claire Anne Morris Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Emily Whiting Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record