LEE CLOUGH MISSION CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN ADDITION TO PROMOTING CHRISTIAN FAITH, ACCOMMODATION IS ALSO PROVIDED FOR A MALE-VOICE CHOIR. THIS GROUP OF 30 MEN REHEARSE EACH WEDNESDAY EVENING FOR PERIODIC CHARITABLE VISITS TO MANY VARIOUS CHURCHES & ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 26 September 1994: Standard registration
- 19 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.14k | £4.88k | £3.68k | £2.35k | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £1.73k | £2.15k | £6.06k | £3.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 24 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 14 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS WORK OF THE INDEPENDENT CHURCH IN BOLTON CONSISTENTLY WITH THE DOCTRINES AND ARTICLES OF FAITH SET OUT IN PART TWO OF THE SCHEDULE HERETO
Area of benefit
BOLTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window