CITIZEN ADVOCACY TRUST GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide advocacy to people vulnerable through disability, to give them a voice to those who have power and influence in their lives. We also provide the Statutory Independant Mental Capacity Advocacy -known as IMCA and the Deprevation of Liberty Safeguards - DoLs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 September 1994: Standard registration
- 10 May 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY FOREST OF DEAN (Working name)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY TRUST - CHELTENHAM (Working name)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY TRUST - GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY TRUST FOREST OF DEAN (Working name)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY-CHELTENHAM (Working name)
- CITIZEN ADVOCACY-GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- CITIZENS ADVOCACY TRUST IN STROUD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.05k | £148.27k | £147.69k | £128.71k | £128.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.73k | £129.92k | £143.57k | £134.66k | £152.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JULY 1994
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, REPRESENTATION AND SERVICES WHICH WILL DIRECTLY RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE 1) SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS 2) HAVE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES 3) PHYSICALLY DISABLED 4) ELDERLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window