THE KATE WALKER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to other registered charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 September 1994: Standard registration
- KATE WALKER TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE SOPHIE WALKER | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DANIEL RONALD WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH CATHERINE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.59k | £5.68k | £5.50k | £25.21k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.16k | £9.00k | £20.16k | £25.00k | £25.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY MAKING GRANTS IN AID TO OTHER CHARITIES VOLUNTARY BODIES AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND MEDICAL SCIENCE (3) THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (4) TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD COACH HOUSE
KELLING
HOLT
NR25 7EW
- Phone:
- 01263711359
- Email:
- katewalkertrust@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window