DIVORCE RECOVERY WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides and supports workshops to help people, who are suffering the trauma of an irretrievable breakdown of a meaningful intimate relationship, to better understand what they are going through. It provides support from others in the same situation and assists in their readjustment to the changes in their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 1994: Standard registration
- DRW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Baxter | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Audrey Briggs | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Ashwood | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ERIC RONALD KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.26k | £3.14k | £3.31k | £4.92k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.28k | £2.98k | £3.45k | £5.73k | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE AT ANY STAGE OF SEPARATION OR DIVORCE AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS FROM THE EMOTIONAL TRAUMA OF DIVORCE AND SEPARATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Perch Cottage
Binsey
OXFORD
OX2 0NG
- Phone:
- 0333 335 0489
- Email:
- drw@drw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window