THE WOLVERHAMPTON RHEUMATOLOGY SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an 8 page bi monthly newsletter. We have telephone helplines. We have an equipment loan service (tens machines etc). We hold information sessions on varied subjects. We take our members on outings, holidays and we hold coffee mornings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 September 1994: Standard registration
- WOLVERHAMPTON RHEUMATOLOGY SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Irenee SIMPSON | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Allen | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Sankey | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iqbal Lally | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Allen | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN SANKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SACHDEVA SACHDEVA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £18.41k | £24.21k | £23.22k | £23.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.45k | £5.87k | £883 | £10.24k | £4.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 October 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 AUGUST 1994 AS AMENDED 1 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS CONCERNING SUCH DISEASES, THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Silverton Way
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV11 3JX
- Phone:
- 01902835248
- Email:
- jansimpson03@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window