HOPE COMMUNITY VILLAGE

Charity number: 1041185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity acts as a resource body providing funds to build homes for abandoned, destitute and orphaned children in India. Additionally, the Charity, also, provides funds to run and maintain the homes it builds in India.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £115,084
Total expenditure: £128,917

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1994: Standard registration
  • 11 December 2024: Funds received from 1003939 HETTY GEORGE DRC TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOMES FOR ORPHANS IN A PROTECTED ENVIRONMENT (Working name)
  • HOPE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAXINE GARBETT Chair
RISHWORTH SCHOOL
Received: 24 days late
Dawn Rogers Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
DR CHERYLE BERRY MBE Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record
STEPHEN REDMOND Trustee 08 June 2012
None on record
BRIGID LIVINUS REDMOND Trustee 08 June 2012
None on record
NORMA RILEY Trustee
WARLEY TRUST
Received: On time
ALAN BROOKS Trustee
None on record
JOHN WILLIAM FRANK VEITCH Trustee
None on record
SANJIV BUTTOO Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE ANNE SHARPE Trustee
None on record
JOHN DORAN FCA Trustee
None on record
NORMA VEITCH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £116.03k £126.45k £146.17k £116.53k £115.08k
Total expenditure £143.75k £121.76k £94.61k £138.78k £128.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 18 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 STAFFORD AVENUE
HALIFAX
HX3 0BH
Phone:
01422363638