THE ISLAMIC FOUNDATION FOR ECOLOGY AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IFEES networks world-wide and invites collaboration from all those who are dedicated to the maintenance of the earth as healthy habitat for future generations of humankind as well as other living beings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Tanzania
Governance
- 29 September 1994: Standard registration
- IFEES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAJMA MOHAMED | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
NAJMUR RIZWAN NAWAZ | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
HAJJ ADNAN ASHFAQ | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUZITA BALL | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ashfaq Ahmed | Trustee | 26 October 2013 |
|
|||||
DR LUTFI RADWAN | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHAID LATIF | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
HARFIYAH ABDELHALEEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAJJ AHMAD THOMSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
EJAZ AHMED QURESHI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £9.82k | £2.69k | £5.16k | £2.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03k | £9.20k | £2.90k | £4.62k | £9.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/10/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND OFFER SOLUTIONS INTO ALL ECOLOGICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AFFECTING THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING THE AVOIDANCE OF ANY KIND OF FURTHER OR NEW OR AS YET UNDISCOVERED POLLUTION AND TO MAKE KNOWN THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC; 2. TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO AND DEVELOP VIABLE METHODS AND TECHNIQUES OF AGRICULTURE AND FARMING THAT ARE NOT HARMFUL TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND WHICH WILL BE OF BENEFIT TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND WHEREVER POSSIBLE TO ESTABLISH A WORKING MODEL OF SUCH METHODS AND TECHNIQUES TO WHICH MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SHALL BE GRANTED ACCESS IN ORDER TO LEARN FROM THEM; 3. TO ASSIST IN PROMOTING AND HELPING TO SUSTAIN TRADITIONAL CRAFTS AND TO ASSIST IN THE TRAINING OF PEOPLE TO KEEP SUCH CRAFTS ALIVE AND TO ASSIST THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN SEEING SUCH CRAFTS BEING PRACTISED IN ORDER TO WIDEN THEIR AWARENESS UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF THEM; 4. TO RELIEVE THE POOR THE YOUNG AND THE ELDERLY AND THE DISABLED PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR NATIONALITY COLOUR AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS; 5. TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS BEING FACILITIES: (A) OF WHICH THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS BY PROMOTING THEIR SPIRITUAL MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING; 6. TO PROMOTE THE MUSLIM FAITH AND WAY OF LIFE AND TO ASSIST IN THE RELIGIOUS AND GENERAL EDUCATION OF MUSLIMS AND IN THE PROPAGATION OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AMONGST OTHERS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD HAVING DUE REGARD FOR THEIR NEED TO BE EDUCATED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF ISLAM AND IN ANY USEFUL KNOWLEDGE NEEDED TO LIVE A GOOD LIFE SO AS TO ADVANCE THEIR SPIRITUAL MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLAMIC FOUNDATION FOR ECOLOGY AND
ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES
93 COURT ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01214403500
- Email:
- info@ifees.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window