The Dentons UK and Middle East LLP Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dentons UK & Middle East LLP Charitable Trust makes donations to small charities in the UK and Ireland that have a connection to our local communities. The Trust has a particular focus on charities working to support the elderly, disabled, homelessness, poverty, ex offenders and their families, refugees, education and youth projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 September 1994: Standard registration
- DENTON WILDE SAPTE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- DENTONS UKMEA LLP CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE SNR DENTON UK LLP CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE WILDE SAPTE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Armstrong | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Brian Steen | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Payton | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL SCOT BODLE | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.43k | £166.87k | £183.88k | £187.18k | £186.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.51k | £133.21k | £175.10k | £150.95k | £185.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/04/2013 as amended on 29 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND/OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE FLEET PLACE
LONDON
EC4M 7WS
- Phone:
- 02072641212
- Email:
- Community.UKIME@dentons.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window