MELMERBY AND MIDDLETON QUERNHOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds by holding events and hiring out the hall to residents of the parish and others.That income is used to maintain the village hall and improve its facilities, then to offer the hall for use by all the inhabitants of the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 29 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB MOORE | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Barnett | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Richardson | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Peirson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN COLLISON | Trustee | 21 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.55k | £14.42k | £21.09k | £5.99k | £8.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £13.97k | £14.97k | £16.51k | £6.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 7 DECEMBER 1944
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MELMERBY AND MIDDLETON QUERNHOW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Maple Garth
Melmerby
Ripon
HG4 5PA
- Phone:
- 01765640950
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window