FRIENDS OF FAWKHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1041235
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

All the activities are carried out in Fawkham, and fawkham School. BBQ's Raffles and Christmas Bazaars.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £19,157
Total expenditure: £9,142

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 September 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caitlin Wheeler Chair 01 October 2019
None on record
Kelly Klus Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Millie-Ann Leenards Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Sharon Hickton Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Natalie Ford Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Susannah Denton Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.85k £5.03k £41 £4.29k £19.16k
Total expenditure £7.37k £4.61k £2.13k £3.50k £9.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 July 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Fawkham C E Primary School
Valley Road
Fawkham
LONGFIELD
DA3 8NA
Phone:
01474702312
Email:
No information available