THE COLIN REID COUNTRYSIDE TRUST
Charity number: 1041243
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants for small quality conservation projects and environmental education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2012
Total income: £1,236
Total expenditure: £5,500
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 September 1994: Standard registration
- 01 May 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- COLIN REID COUNTRYSIDE TRUST (Working name)
- COLIN REID COUNTRYSIDE TRUST - C R C T (Working name)
- CRCT (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.63k | £1.47k | £5.95k | £560 | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £4.00k | £7.98k | £4.50k | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 04 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 06 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 24 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 30 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window