RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL MILE END

Charity Number: 1041244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides pre-school care for children aged 2 years to school age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £75,355
Total expenditure: £68,169

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (Working name)
  • RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (COLCHESTER) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cathy Ellen Joyner Chair 01 October 2021
None on record
Jenny-Louise Meggs Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Petra Ohrablova Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Keeley Anne Johnson Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
David Beddoes Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Gina Oxford Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £43.82k £57.31k £59.10k £72.54k £75.36k
Total expenditure £46.94k £52.26k £55.81k £63.04k £68.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £48.66k £58.38k £62.17k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MILE END METHODIST CHURCH
NAYLAND ROAD
MILE END
COLCHESTER
CO4 5ET
Phone:
07779349128