Accounts and annual returns THE SHEFFIELD CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1041250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 September 2022 234 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window