Financial history THE SHEFFIELD CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1041250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £871.36k £800.45k £733.83k £599.85k £961.39k
Total expenditure £802.31k £739.93k £728.98k £803.24k £1.08m
Income from government contracts £741.40k £753.55k £729.22k £587.42k £550.68k
Income from government grants N/A £20.09k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.01k £13.96k £2.37k £2.83k £2.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £850.03k £785.57k £729.22k £594.19k £949.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.49k £827 £143 £2.68k £9.27k
Income - Other £6.83k £92 £2.10k £152 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £802.31k £739.93k £728.98k £803.24k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.44k £2.48k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0