Financial history LEEDS JEWISH WELFARE BOARD

Charity number: 1041257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.62m £4.10m £4.08m £4.57m £346.05k
Total expenditure £3.84m £3.76m £4.14m £3.96m £3.58m
Income from government contracts £1.96m £2.12m £1.95m £1.86m £204.64k
Income from government grants £70.63k £190.38k £116.09k £16.02k £58.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £804.20k £1.05m £701.21k £1.86m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.71m £2.82m £2.72m £2.62m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £103.08k £114.54k £86.35k £92.71k N/A
Income - Other £0 £109.50k £569.84k £117 N/A
Income - Legacies £44.01k £249.16k £15.83k £26.14k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.59m £3.61m £3.69m £3.78m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £253.72k £154.69k £133.84k £182.28k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £25.41k £15.20k £17.04k £21.08k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £27.32k £98.04k £25.52k £34.36k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £318.19k £0 N/A