SIDMOUTH TWINNING CIRCLE TRUSTEES CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop twinning links in Sidmouth Town with other similar towns in other Countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 06 October 1994: Standard registration
- 08 May 2025: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- SIDMOUTH TWINNING CIRCLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14k | £0 | £195 | £762 | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £919 | £182 | £75 | £242 | £3.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 SEPTMEBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN SIDMOUTH DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE CULTURES AND LANGUAGES OF THE INHABITANTS OF COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDON BY: 1) FOSTERING EDUCATIONAL LINKS BETWEEN THE RESIDENTS OF SIDMOUTH AND DISTRICT AND THE RESIDENTS OF COUNTRIES OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS AND AWARDS FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF SIDMOUTH AND DISTRICT TO STUDY OTHER COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR THEIR CULTURES AND LANGUAGES AND PROVIDE THE COST OF SUCH TRAVEL TO THOSE COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
SIDMOUTH DEVON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window