FRIENDS OF THE HOMELESS IN FAREHAM & GOSPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is the aim of the Friends of the Homeless in Fareham and Gosport to provide support for anyone in the area who is homeless, at risk of becoming homeless or in a crisis situation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Total income includes £10,634 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 October 1994: Standard registration
- 08 July 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 July 2022: Funds transferred to 1194360 FRIENDS OF THE HOMELESS IN FAREHAM AND GOSPORT
- FRIENDS OF THE HOMELESS IN FAREHAM (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.26k | £16.93k | £29.06k | £49.43k | £81.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.11k | £17.99k | £17.77k | £12.53k | £45.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 17 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY PRIMARILY AMONGST HOMELESS PERSONS, BUT ALSO THOSE AT RISK OF HOMELESSNESS AND THOSE ON LOW INCOME WHO ARE SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THOSE IN NEED"), PRIMARILY WITHIN THE AREA OF FAREHAM, BUT ALSO WITHIN THE AREA OF GOSPORT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- 1. FURTHERING AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS AND METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF HOMELESSNESS, AND TO OBTAIN AND MAKE RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME; 2. PROMOTING, SUPPORTING OR CARRYING ON EITHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY BODY, AUTHORITY OR PERSON, ANY PROJECT OF SCHEME TO OVERCOME HOMELESSNESS AND TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP OF "THOSE IN NEED"; 3. PROVIDING MONIES FOR SUCH PURPOSES WHETHER BY WAY OF LOAN OR OTHERWISE
Area of benefit
FAREHAM & GOSPORT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window