THE ROTARY CLUB OF SCUNTHORPE PENTAGON TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1041294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rotary Club. Fund raising activities. Money distributed to individuals and groups, locally, nationally and internationally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £10,973
Total expenditure: £16,573

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROTARY CLUB OF SCUNTHORPE PENTAGON TRUST FUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martyn Paul Whitehouse Trustee 21 November 2017
None on record
David John Spencer Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
KEVIN IBBERTSON Trustee
NORTH LINCS ROTARY SWIMARATHON CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
STUART JOHN FRANCIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.79k £6.46k £7.70k £24.39k £10.97k
Total expenditure £14.03k £13.88k £8.90k £23.15k £16.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 THE DELL
BROUGHTON
BRIGG
DN20 0WA
Phone:
07443865663