Christchurch C of E Primary School

Charity number: 1041318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School fund raising - Christmas and summer fetes, film nights, disco's, quiz nights, raffles etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023

Total income: £3,805
Total expenditure: £2,989

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Christchurch C of E Primary School PTFA (Working name)
  • LATCHINGDON SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
  • LATCHINGDON SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARYANNE HARKETT Chair 01 October 2023
None on record
Jess Crease Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Erin Argyle Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £3.05k £355 £5.18k £9.81k £3.81k
Total expenditure £8.98k £23.08k £2.25k £8.95k £2.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 16 July 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 29 February 2024 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 05 July 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 02 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chritschurch Primary School
THE STREET
LATCHINGDON
ESSEX
CM3 6JS
Phone:
01621740328
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available