YEADON THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATIC & DRAMATIC SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 October 1994: Standard registration
- YEADON THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- THE YEADON AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Mary Saville | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Almond | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA POOLE | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.86k | £2.77k | £24.71k | £50.33k | £64.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.52k | £5.14k | £31.22k | £38.23k | £46.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED PRIOR TO 1962 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1991 as amended on 31 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE TOWNSHIP OF YEADON
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 Weston Lane
Otley
LS21 2DF
- Phone:
- 01943462283
- Email:
- pam.beck@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window