Financial history SARAH WADE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1041383
Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £3.59k £3.20k £3.46k £3.91k £4.10k
Total expenditure £3.58k £3.16k £3.63k £3.85k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A