Financial history LEARNING TO WORK (SOUTH EAST) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1041403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £565.82k £427.26k £458.39k £487.46k £738.43k
Total expenditure £721.13k £446.89k £452.42k £471.18k £765.86k
Income from government contracts £20.65k N/A £39.12k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £44.55k N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £520.92k N/A N/A N/A £736.52k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £357 N/A N/A N/A £1.91k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £721.13k N/A N/A N/A £764.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.15k