THE ST. JAMES' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES TO GENERATE INCOME TO BUY EQUIPMENT OR RUN ACTIVITIES TO ENHANCE PUPIL'S LEARNING EXPERIENCES AT SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 October 1994: Standard registration
- THE SJA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Sanders-Corridan | Chair | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Gratton | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Offord | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £5.35k | £8.90k | £13.45k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £8.82k | £4.07k | £9.35k | £11.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ST JAMES PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELLEVUE LANE
EMSWORTH
HAMPSHIRE
PO10 7PX
- Phone:
- 01243372715
- Email:
- stjames.sja@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window