Financial history SOUTH BRETTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041420
Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £5.94k £4.80k £4.92k £4.80k £3.77k
Total expenditure £6.42k £6.57k £5.20k £4.75k £3.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A