Accounts and annual returns CEREBRAL PALSY CARE KENT

Charity number: 1041434
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 05 April 2013 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 05 April 2013 64 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 01 February 2012 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 01 February 2012 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time