Accounts and annual returns THE NEWHAM BENGALI COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1041547
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 29 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 25 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 January 2009 On Time