Financial history THE NEWHAM BENGALI COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1041547
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £45.19k £62.54k £51.18k £62.40k £72.50k
Total expenditure £46.16k £46.83k £41.96k £55.72k £65.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A