Governing document THE NEWHAM BENGALI COMMUNITY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 14TH AUGUST 1994, 5TH DECEMBER 1996, 3RD SEPTEMBER 1998, 31ST MAY 2000 AND 17TH SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF BENGALIS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM (THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT) TO: (1) ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY AND BENGALI MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES IN BOTH THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT AND BANGLADESH; (II) RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR UNEMPLOYED PERSONS BY ADVISING ON TRAINING SCHEMES IN BOTH THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT AND BANGLADESH (III) RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS SUFFERING THE SAME AS A RESULT OF UNWANTED MARRIAGES AND OR DOMESTIC ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (IV) RELIEVE DISABLED AND ELDERLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CENTRE AND ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT AND BANGLADESH; AND (V) PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT AND BANGLADESH
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.