Financial history THE KALGIDHAR TRUST

Charity number: 1041548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £645.00k £709.00k £790.00k £1.19m £886.00k
Total expenditure £721.00k £761.00k £800.00k £1.04m £961.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £645.00k £682.00k £753.00k £978.00k £829.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £27.00k £37.00k £213.00k £57.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £721.00k £696.00k £746.00k £995.00k £914.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £47.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £46.00k £43.00k £60.00k £70.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £823.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £65.00k £54.00k £48.00k £0