THE TWELVE MEN OF WREAY

Charity Number: 1041581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

grant to school and scholars bursaries to secondary school and university property upkeep

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,740
Total expenditure: £1,492

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR MIKE JONES Chair
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Christopher Philip Bull Trustee 13 February 2024
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
George William Coulthard Trustee 13 February 2023
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
Raymond John Whittaker Trustee 13 February 2020
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
James William Cruickshank Trustee 13 February 2020
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
John Anthony Bird Trustee 12 February 2015
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL TURNBULL Trustee 19 March 2012
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
GEOFREY WILSON Trustee
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STANLEY BIRD Trustee
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RICHARD DIXON Trustee
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RICHARD FISHER Trustee
CHARITY OF SARAH LOSH (KNOWN AS LOSH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Received: On time
SCHOOL LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
WREAY VILLAGE LIBRARY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.04k £5.04k £5.40k £5.47k £5.74k
Total expenditure £442 £2.44k £2.32k £1.87k £1.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FOULBRIDGE
WREAY
CARLISLE
CA4 0RR
Phone:
01697473544
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available