Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BIDDULPH TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1041602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.47k £3.13k £12.10k £10.23k £11.18k
Total expenditure £15.06k £20 £10.69k £11.81k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A