ROTARY CLUB OF BIDDULPH TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1041602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Giving donations to local and national charity groups, Organising Educational opportunities. Supporting local good causes. Supporting Rotary's Charity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £11,179
Total expenditure: £7,813

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Ash Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Michael Broom Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Peter Swann Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.47k £3.13k £12.10k £10.23k £11.18k
Total expenditure £15.06k £20 £10.69k £11.81k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 June 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
49 Pennine Way
Biddulph
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST8 7EF
Phone:
01782 522990
Website:

biddulphrotary.uk