BARNET EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To obtain grants and funding from appropriate organisations and distribute it in education and training of students with respect to future employment and career opportunities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income includes £35,337 from 1 government contract(s) and £35,337 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Barnet
Governance
- 26 October 1994: Standard registration
- 05 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- BARNET E.B.P. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.54k | £120.18k | £122.28k | £99.13k | £90.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.77k | £156.25k | £121.78k | £97.90k | £90.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.34k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EQUIPPING THEM FOR EMPLOYMENT IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window